judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PASSALACQUA (ROSOLINO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34964
Short Caption:PASSALACQUA (ROSOLINO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 99CR0048Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09946
10/19/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person. Attorney Dennis A. Cameron shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 99-10142
11/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-11043
11/18/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The response provisionally submitted on November 9, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-11443
11/18/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-11045
12/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Transcript request form or certificate stating that no transcript is required due: 10 days. Fast track statement due: 40 days. 99-12738
01/24/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-01148
01/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-01149
01/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. September 7, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 00-01304
02/11/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: February 22, 2000. 00-02155
02/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-02603
02/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-02604
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07758
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09502
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/12/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 9, 2000. 00-09502