judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MULLINAX CONCRETE SERVICE COMPANY, a Wyoming corporation v. MERLIN AND LORI ZOWADA and THE SHERIDAN COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS,

Case Heading (S-11-0213)
Case Number:S-11-0213Case Docketed On:09/15/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:MULLINAX CONCRETE SERVICE COMPANY, a Wyoming corporation v. MERLIN AND LORI ZOWADA and THE SHERIDAN COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS,
Full Title:MULLINAX CONCRETE SERVICE COMPANY, a Wyoming corporation, Petitioner, v. MERLIN AND LORI ZOWADA and THE SHERIDAN COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerMullinax Concrete Service Company, Inc.Anthony Todd Wendtland
Debra J. Wendtland
RespondentMerlin H. ZowadaH.W. Rasmussen
RespondentLori ZowadaH.W. Rasmussen
RespondentThe Board of County Commissioners of Sheridan County, WyomingMatthew F. Redle

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Roads
Opinion Number:2012 WY 55
Citation:273 P.3d 474

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/15/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/15/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/15/2011Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
09/26/2011Response/Objection - Petition for review (Respondents Zowada)Response/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
09/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Errata (attaches page 8 of Exhibit B to the response to petition for writ of review)Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
09/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Writ of Review Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 13EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - ErrataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/04/2011Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
11/18/2011Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
11/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's brief in support of writ of review pursuant to W.R.A.P. 13EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's statement regarding transcript and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/29/2011Response/Objection - Petition for review (brief of respondent).Response/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
12/30/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellee County CommissionBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
01/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Respondents' (Zowada) Brief in Opposition to Writ of Review Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 13EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting H. W. Rasmussen obo RespondentNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Debra Wendtland for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/19/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Anthony Wendtland or Debra Wendtland to appear obo PetitionerNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/19/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance by Debra J. Wendtland on behalf of PetitionerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/15/2012Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before full court (Debra Wendtland for appellant; H.W. Rasmussen for appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/11/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 4/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal