judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETER O'DONNELL V. GRIDPOINT, INC.

Case Information: 11-CV-0387
Short Caption:PETER O'DONNELL V. GRIDPOINT, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6241-08Filed Date:03/22/2011

Opening Event Date:03/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/15/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/01/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/15/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPeter O'Donnell N
Peter C. HansenYY
AppelleeGridppoint Inc.N
Mark A. SmithYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 22, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcripts available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/03/2011LETTER from Appellant's counsel regarding In Forma Pauperis Status and the ordering of Transcripts IFP.
05/11/2011 On consideration of counsel for appellant's response to this court's order of April 11, 2011, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcripts, and it appearing that appellant has improperly filed a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis in the trial court subsequent to the filing of the notice of appeal, and the lodged copy of the motion and financial information statement, it is ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. It is (MORE)
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied as appellant's family income exceeds the limits set for proceeding on appel in forma pauperis. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order file the statement regarding transcripts. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
05/24/2011LETTER from aplt's counsel re May 11, 2011 order. *construed as the SRT (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/25/11) (elp)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (17-pgs/tape 2/25/11 proc).w/cd
06/15/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/17/2011RECORD INDEX
07/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until Sept. 23, 2011 (Appellee)
09/07/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellant)
09/15/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
09/19/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING/OPPO/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO/REPLY
09/23/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motin for summary affirmance (Appellant)
10/04/2011FiledReply to Appellant's Opposition to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
10/18/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THE BRIEF AS MOOT
10/18/2011WithdrawnAffirmed
11/07/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider - the court's order granting of the aple's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)Granted
11/07/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO RECONSIDER
12/14/2011FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION and the JUDGMENT ENTERED ON OCTOBER 28, 2011 IS VACATED and...
12/14/2011FiledORDERED THAT APPELLEE SHALL FILE ITS BRIEF W/N 30 DAYS
01/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/01/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
02/01/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/01/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/01/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
05/04/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/26/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Beckwith, Easterly Peter C. Hansen, Esq. for appellant
09/26/2012FiledMotion for opportunity to present oral argument on behalf of appellee (Appellee)Denied as Moot
10/05/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's motion to hold second oral hearing (Appellant)
10/16/2012FiledReply to appellant's opposition to request for oral argument. (Appellee)
10/24/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Beckwith, and Easterly, Assoicate Judges)
10/24/2012FiledDenied as moot aple's motion to present oral argument.
11/06/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
01/07/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
01/15/2013FiledMandate