judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2750
B-2750
05/27/1971
MISC PETITION
E. N. ELLSWORTH
MARTIN DIES, JR., SECRETARY OF STATE OF TEXAS AND ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/08/1971Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
07/08/1971Motion for RehearingRelator
06/16/1971Reply to ResponseRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/1971Response to Motion filed
07/08/1971Brief in Support of Petition
07/08/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/16/1971Reply to Response
06/04/1971Response to Motion filed
05/27/1971Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E. N. EllsworthRelator
Martin Dies, Jr., Secretary of State of Texas and Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information