judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLARD (GARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34963
Short Caption:COLLARD (GARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C119714Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09922
10/19/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney John T. Kelleher shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-10140
11/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. September 21, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 99-11671
11/29/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. September 21, 1999. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 99-11815
04/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-05492
04/17/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 04/28/00. 00-06115
04/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 17, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a fast track statement in this appeal. The fast track statement filed in this appeal is entirely inadequate. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall strike the fast track statement filed on April 17, 2000. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve a fast track statement and appendix that comports with the requirements of NRAP 3C(e) within 20 days of this order, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C. NRAP 3C(n). 00-06926
04/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (fast track statement filed 4/17/00- Stricken 4/28/00). 00-06984
05/17/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-08256
05/17/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-08257
06/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 17, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as appellant's attorney of record. Counsel may not withdraw until he or she has fulfilled the obligations set forth in NRAP 3C(b). The motion to withdraw is therefore denied. On May 17, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion is granted. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 20 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-09269
06/19/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-10406
07/26/2000MotionFiled Motion. Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (Attorney John T. Kelleher) 00-12967
08/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for respondent shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve the fast track response or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. On July 26, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Because counsel for appellant has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel, the motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing appellate counsel for appeal. Due Dates: Appoint counsel 30 days. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain appellate counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order on appellate counsel. From appointment: enter appearance 10 days. Appellants counsel may file a supplemental fast track statement. fn2[Such supplemental fast track statement must be filed within 20 days of appointment.] 00-14190
08/24/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Fast Track Statement. 00-14872
08/24/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-14873
09/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 24, 2000, respondent file a response to this court's order and filed a motion to strike the fast track statement filed in this appeal. The motion to strike is denied. Respondent has shown adequate cause why respondent should not be sanctioned. Respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days of this order. 00-16219
10/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17660
10/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-17661
11/06/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed copy of order filed in district court on October 25, 2000, appointing William J. Taylor as counsel for appellant. 00-19493
11/06/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of counsel pursant to NRAP 3C(g) from attorney William J. Taylor. 00-19494
01/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We have reviewed the record on appeal, and for the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, conclude that appellant's contentions lack merit. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-00422
02/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00658
02/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2001. 01-00658