judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD E. INMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0211)
Case Number:S-11-0211Case Docketed On:09/13/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DONALD E. INMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD E. INMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald E. InmanRobert J. O'Neil
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 107
Citation:281 P.3d 745

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/13/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/13/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/25/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Brief of Appellant - W.R.A.P. 7.10(a)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/25/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/07/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant W.R. A.P. 7.01 and Designation of Record on Appeal (Captioned in Supreme Court, advised counsel it should be filed in District Court)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/27/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2012Order - Other - Order directing appellant to file principal brief in compliance with W.R.A.P. 7.05 (b)(2)OrderOtherFinal
01/17/2012Brief - Appellant, corrected brief per Court's orderBriefAppellantFinal
01/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/23/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/24/2012Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for appellant and requested the original plus six copies of the corrected brief of appellant that was e-filed on 1/17/2012.EventPhone CallFinal
01/26/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Replacement Brief of Appellant (per Court's order)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Robert O'Neil obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/13/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Robert J. O'Neil for Appellant; Meri Vania Geringer for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/07/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/30/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/29/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal