judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUSTIN STEVENS, ET AL V. MPM MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Information: 11-CV-0419
Short Caption:JUSTIN STEVENS, ET AL V. MPM MANAGEMENT, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB34584-10Filed Date:03/30/2011

Opening Event Date:03/30/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/09/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJustin StevensYPro SeN
AppellantJames C. BallardNPro SeN
AppelleeMPM Management Inc.N
Sheldon P. SchumanNN
Timothy P. ColeYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/30/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 30, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
04/20/2011RECEIVED - (MOTION FOR APPEAL TRANSCRIPT) *filed by appellant (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED FOR 2/28/11 & 6/29/09) **PER CRD no proceedings held on 6/29/09
04/28/2011RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcript filed by appellant (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 2/28/11 and 6/29/09) (elp)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (77-pgs/tape 2/28/11 proc.)w/cd
06/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/06/2011RECORD INDEX
06/06/2011RECORD COPIES
06/10/2011 It appearing that appellant has requested transcript for the proceeding date of June 29, 2009, and the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court has indicated that no hearing was held on that date, and it further appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. app. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellant) (NO APPENDIX)
08/01/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days
08/16/2011FiledMotion to amend caption (Appellant)Denied
08/16/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File to file appendix (Appellant)Granted
09/12/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion to amend caption (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File to file appendix (Appellant
09/12/2011FiledReceived- appendix (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/09/2012FiledSubmitted to Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, Steadman
04/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
05/22/2012FiledMandate