judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NELSON VS. FIRST SECURITY BANK

Case Information: 38421
Short Caption:NELSON VS. FIRST SECURITY BANKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A421804Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2001 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14844
09/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/10/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Confidential Settlement Statement. 01-17062
10/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The case appeal statement was due to be filed and the filing fee was due to be paid by September 14, 2001; and the docketing statement was due to be filed by September 19, 2001. To date appellant has failed to file the required documents, and pay the filing fee. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order: (1) file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement; (2) file and serve the docketing statement; and (3) pay the filing fee to the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-17455
11/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18857
11/13/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-18858
11/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 13, 2001, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. An appeal shall not be dismissed, however, until the parties first "pay whatever fees are due." Appellant shall submit the $200 filing fee to the clerk of this court within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. We defer action on the stipulation to dismiss this appeal, pending payment of the filing fee. 01-19828
12/03/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David C. Amesbury - check no. 0552.
01/17/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK 02-01137
01/17/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.