Case Information: 14-AA-0030 | |||
Short Caption: | ROLA SANGODEYI V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Employment Services |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DOES2180-13 | Filed Date: | 01/13/2014 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/13/2014 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 06/03/2014 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/19/2015 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Petitioner | Rola Sangodeyi | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||||||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/13/2014 | Filed | Petition For Review (nunc pro tunc) | ||
01/13/2014 | Filed | Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Petitioner) | Granted | |
02/03/2014 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Petitioner) | ||
02/03/2014 | Filed | Initial Order - directing record | ||
02/03/2014 | Filed | Service Of Petition On OAH & DOES | ||
06/03/2014 | Filed | Record On Appeal | ||
06/03/2014 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/11/2014 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
07/21/2014 | Filed | Brief (Petitioner) | ||
07/21/2014 | Filed | Appendix (Titled as: Exhibit A) (Petitioner) | ||
08/15/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | Granted | |
08/26/2014 | Filed | Opposition to motion for extension of time to file brief. (Petitioner) | ||
09/09/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 9/24/14 | ||
09/23/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) | Granted | |
10/06/2014 | Filed | Opposition to respondent's second motion for extension of time to file initial brief (Petitioner) | ||
10/16/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 10/24/14 | ||
10/21/2014 | Filed | Motion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent) | Granted | |
10/24/2014 | Filed | TMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE | ||
05/28/2015 | Filed | JUDMENT Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance | ||
05/28/2015 | Filed | Affirmed | ||
06/19/2015 | Filed | Mandate |