judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HANSON VS. LVMPD

Case Information: 38420
Short Caption:HANSON VS. LVMPDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A425434Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/05/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Marilyn Hanson--check no. 8700.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14835
09/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-15264
10/05/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 01-16787
10/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Directing Response. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to demonstrate why the district court's order should not be reversed and the case remanded for further proceedings. fn3[Failure to timely respond to this order will be treated as a confession of error.] 01-21751
01/17/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-01154
02/04/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Reversal and Remand. The district court erred by denying Hanson's motion to set aside the default judgment. "We reverse the district court's order and remand this matter to the district court with instructions to set aside the default judgment." fn14[Although Hanson has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have received and considered his proper person documents. We deny as moot Hanson's proper person motions for leave to file briefs, for enlargement of time, and for document disclosure.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-02199
03/01/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 02-02251
03/01/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 7, 2002. 02-02251