judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEFFREY M. YOUNG-BEY V. RICKY RICARDO YOUNG, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0418
Short Caption:JEFFREY M. YOUNG-BEY V. RICKY RICARDO YOUNG, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR4515-10Filed Date:03/29/2011

Opening Event Date:03/29/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJeffrey M. Young-Bey YPro SeN
AppelleeRicky Ricardo Young N
Vaughn RoyalNY
AppelleeTijuana Young NPro SeN
AppelleeVaughne Royal N
Zachary G. WilliamsNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL Ricky Young
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
05/11/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL IS GRANTED and this appeal IS DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 13(a). It is ***MORE****
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BY: ETW) LW
05/11/2011DISMISSED
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED