judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRAN VS. MEADOWS BRANCH

Case Information: 34961
Short Caption:TRAN VS. MEADOWS BRANCHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A396359Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/29/1999 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/27/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Stanley W. Pierce--check no. 33158.
10/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09913
10/22/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 18, 1999 and August 30, 1999. To Court Reporter: Carrie A. Hansen. (Certificate of No Transcript Request: Transcripts were filed in district court and delivered to counsel prior to docketing of appeal.ah) 99-10348
10/27/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-10525
10/29/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-11239
11/22/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-11670
01/27/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-01369
02/14/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Having received the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. fn1[We defer ruling respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal pending completion of our jurisdictional review.] Appellants: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-02278
04/24/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 4/19/00. 00-06567
04/24/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-06569
05/17/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/16/00. 00-08227
06/15/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 6/13/00. 00-10196
07/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. Respondent filed a motion to dismiss on the basis that this court lacks jurisdiction over the appeal. Appellant filed an opposition to the motion. Having concluded that jurisdiction in this court is proper, we deny the motion to dismiss. 00-12017
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-15042
08/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/27/2001Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel: SNP01A-CY/ML/NB.
07/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "AFFIRM the order of the district court." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11737
08/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11974
08/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11974