judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SECOND EPISCOPAL DIST. AME CH.,ETAL V. REV. DELORIS PRIOLEAU

Case Information: 11-CV-0382
Short Caption:SECOND EPISCOPAL DIST. AME CH.,ETAL V. REV. DELORIS PRIOLEAUClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6532-09Filed Date:03/22/2011

Opening Event Date:03/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/02/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/31/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSecond Episcopal District African Methodist ChurchN
Winfred R. MundleYN
Samuel C. HamiltonNN
AppellantCornerstone AME ChurchN
Winfred R. MundleNN
Samuel C. HamiltonYN
AppelleeDeloris Prioleau N
Bernard C. Coleman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/12/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANTS SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... SEE HARDCOPY (BY: ETW)
04/12/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/27/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellants)
05/31/2011 ORDERED that the SHOW CAUSE ORDER IS DISCHARGED and the parties shall address the jurisdictional issues in their briefs. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANTS shall w/n 20 days COMPLETE AND FILE A SINGLE COPY OF A SRT... (FIBEKG)
06/24/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 31, 2011, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellants have failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. (ETW) elp
06/24/2011WithdrawnDISMISSED
06/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
07/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Reinstate Appeal and F/O a briefing order will be issued upon the filing of record index and transcripts
07/27/2011FiledRecord Index
07/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (151-pgs/tape 3/3/11 proc.)w/cd
07/27/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/03/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (10 Days) (Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)Granted
09/15/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal "AND" opposition to aplt's motion to extend time to file brief (Appellee)Denied
09/22/2011LodgedBrief (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church, Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Amended/Corrected Brief (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church, Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)Granted
10/03/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church, Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)
10/18/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appellant's Opposition out of time (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church, Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Amended/Corrected Brief (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church, Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church) and DIRECTING APPELLEE's BRIEF
11/03/2011FiledAmended/Corrected Brief (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church, Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)
11/03/2011FiledAppendix AND Supplement to the Appendix (includes 3 plum colored books titled: The Doctrine and Discipline of the African Methodist Episcopal Church) (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church, Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)
11/03/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion to dismiss appeal (Appellant Cornerstone AME Church)
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (10 Days) (Appellant Second Episcopal District African Methodist Church)
11/03/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion To Dismiss Appeal
12/02/2011FiledBrief (Prioleau) (Appellee)
12/02/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/15/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee - Delores Prioleau)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/02/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
05/15/2012FiledArgued Before Wsahington,Fisher,Easterly, Winfred R. Mundle Esq.,for appellant, Bernard C. Coleman Esq.,for appellee.
08/09/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Washington, Chief, and Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges.)
08/23/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee)Granted
08/24/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR COSTS
08/24/2012LodgedLetter From Appellee Prioleau advising of an error in the Court's Opinion dated August 9, 2012 (Appellee)
08/31/2012FiledMandate
10/16/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR COSTS