judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVIN D. BOWEN v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-10-0063)
Case Number:S-10-0063Case Docketed On:03/25/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:KEVIN D. BOWEN v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:KEVIN D. BOWEN, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKevin D. BowenJames A. Eddington
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Jackson Matthew Engels

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2011 WY 1
Citation:245 P.3d 827

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/25/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/12/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, State of Wyoming, Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/20/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/04/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/20/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/20/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/25/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/21/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal