judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DIAZ (DWAYNE)

Case Information: 34976
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIAZ (DWAYNE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37085
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980403Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09994
11/08/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: November 15, 1999. 99-11016
11/10/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 9/9/99. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. 99-11091
11/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11163
11/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-11164
12/21/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice to the Court (attaching withdrawal of attorney Picker filed in district court on October 15, 1999). 99-12960
03/29/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On December 21, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a notice informing this court that he is no longer counsel of record for appellant. We construe counsel's notice as a motion to withdraw. The motion to withdraw is denied. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 00-05073
04/14/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-06029
04/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days of this order. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-06187
05/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-07428
06/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we reverse the order of the district court granting respondent's motion to dismiss, and we remand this matter for further proceedings." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-10168
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11851
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 13, 2000. 00-11851