judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WALTER J. TEACHWORTH, ET AL. v. HON. BERT H. TUNKS, JOHN M. BARRON, AND SAM D. JOHNSON, HOWARD TERRY AND WALTER MISCHER

Case: B-2738
B-2738
05/20/1971
MISC PETITION
WALTER J. TEACHWORTH, ET AL.
HON. BERT H. TUNKS, JOHN M. BARRON, AND SAM D. JOHNSON, HOWARD TERRY AND WALTER MISCHER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/20/1971Letter brief Relator
07/05/1971Motion for RehearingRelator
06/21/1971Reply to ResponseRelator
05/20/1971Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/20/1971Letter brief
07/05/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/21/1971Reply to Response
06/10/1971Response to Motion filed
06/09/1971Response to Motion filed
05/20/1971Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
05/20/1971Exhibits in case/cause filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Howard Terry and Walter MischerRespondent
Walter J. Teachworth, et al.Relator
Hon. Bert H. Tunks, John M. Barron, and Sam D. JohnsonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information