judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: RICHARD KARCH, APLT

Case Information: 11-PR-0399
Short Caption:IN RE: RICHARD KARCH, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:INT85-01Filed Date:02/09/2011

Opening Event Date:02/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard R. Karch YPro SeN
AppelleeAndrea J. Sloan NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL-NPT 12/20/2010 ***SEE 5/18/11 ORDER LW
04/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (36-pgs/johnson 11/19/10 proc.)W/CD
04/11/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall w/20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(a). (BY: ETW)
04/12/2011RECORD COPIES
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX
04/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/18/2011 On further consideration of this court's 4/11/11 order...and it appearing that the NOA WAS LODGED ON DECEMBER 20, 2010 with the motion for IFP and therefore when the motion was granted the NOA should have been FILED, NPT, TO DECEMBER 20, 2010...it is ORDERED that the OTSC IS HEREBY VACATED as the NOA WAS TIMELY FILED. It is *****MORE*****
05/18/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S BRIEF and limited appendix...shall be filed w/n 40 days and appellee's brief w/n 30 days thereafter. (BY: ETW) LW
07/12/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix accompanied by a motion for leave withn 20 days
08/17/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
08/17/2011FiledDismissed
09/08/2011FiledMandate