judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GORDON (STEVON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34975
Short Caption:GORDON (STEVON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37048
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982359Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09992
10/19/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Paul Giese shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-10146
11/18/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11463
11/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-11653
12/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-12343
03/01/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in proper person, we have considered appellant's proper person documents submitted to this court on November 12, 1999, January 11, 2000, and February 1, 2000, and conclude they do not warrant the relief requested.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03203
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04920
03/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2000. 00-04920