judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSE MANUEL DIAZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0226)
Case Number:S-11-0226Case Docketed On:09/26/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:JOSE MANUEL DIAZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOSE MANUEL DIAZ, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerJose Manuel DiazDiane Elizabeth Courselle
RespondentThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/26/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/26/2011Motion - In forma pauperis - Motion to proceed on writ of review or in the alternative writ for certiorari in forma pauperis; and received proposed order.MotionIn forma pauperisFinal
09/26/2011Petition - Writ - review - Petition for writ of review or in the alternative petition for writ of certiorariPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
10/05/2011Affidavit - OtherAffidavitOtherFinal
10/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Supplement to the Motion to Proceed on Writ of Review or in the Alternative Writ for Certiorari in Forma PauperisEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Incoming - District Court Pleadings - Received copy of designation of record and certification concerning transcript.Notice-IncomingDistrict Court PleadingFinal
10/11/2011Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
10/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Response to petition for writ of review or in the alternative petition for writ of certiorariEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2011Order - Denying Petition for Writ of Review and Order Granting, In Part, Petition for Writ of CertiorariOrderDenyFinal
12/29/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order on remandRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder on remandFinal
01/10/2012Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
01/10/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal