judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AGRE VS. RICH

Case Information: 34974
Short Caption:AGRE VS. RICHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9200942Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/29/1999 / Jenkins, NathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark H. Gunderson, Ltd.--check no. 11364.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09993
10/22/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-10375
10/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Charles R. Zeh, Esq.--check no. 7709.
10/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 99-10544
10/28/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Alice Kung verifying that no docketing statement is due at this time. 99-10558
10/29/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Substitution of Counsel. Frederick R. Olmstead in place of Mark H. Gunderson as counsel for appellant/cross-respondent. 99-11351
11/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service. (for Substitution of Counsel) 99-11364
11/18/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
04/06/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 13, 2000. 00-05552
06/12/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-09912
06/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal and cross-appeal. The parties have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal and cross-appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal and cross-appeal. 00-10760
06/27/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal filed in district court on June 22, 2000. 00-10999
07/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-12171
07/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.