judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JANNICE HODGE-BANNERMAN V. AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION

Case Information: 11-CV-0397
Short Caption:JANNICE HODGE-BANNERMAN V. AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:11-CV-0397Consolidated: 11-CV-1027
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8044-09Filed Date:03/21/2011

Opening Event Date:03/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:07/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/29/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/10/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJannice Hodge-Bannerman N
Robert L. BellYY
AppelleeAmerican Bar AssociationN
Reenah L. KimYN
Raymond C. BaldwinYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/04/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 21, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
04/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (*SRT docketed by P.O. 5/9/11) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/18/10) (elp)
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (58-pgs/tape 11/18/10 proc.)w/cd
04/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/05/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 4, 2011, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 20 days, and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp (**SEE 5/11/ORDER BELOW) (elp)
05/09/2011NOTICE RECEIVED- from aplt of timely filing of statement regarding transcript in lieu of motion for leave to file out of time (*It appearing that statement regarding transcript was filed with this court on 4/18/11, and inadvertently not docketed by P.O.) (elp)
05/12/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 5, 2011, which directed appellant to submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and the response thereto, and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript was filed with this court on April 18, 2011, but it was inadvertently omitted from the docket, and it further appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that this court's order of May 5, 2011, is hereby vacated in it entirety. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1) shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW) elp
06/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/21/2011APPENDIX (Vols 1, 2 & 3 in brown box)
07/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/21/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/30/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals and Directing Appellant to file brief addressing issues raised in appeal no. 11-CV-1027, within 40 days and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter.
10/11/2011FiledBrief (in Appeal No. 11-CV-1027) (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledAppendix (in Appeal No. 11-CV-1027) (Appellant)
11/09/2011FiledBrief (in Appeal 11-CV-1027) (Appellee)
12/02/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/29/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Steadman Robert L. Bell, Esq. for appellant Raymond C. Baldwin, Esq. for appellee
07/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
07/19/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
10/02/2012FiledOrdered that appellant's petition for rehearing en banc is denied.
10/10/2012FiledMandate
02/21/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)