judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARD (DALE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34973
Short Caption:WARD (DALE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38435 , 78475 , 78475-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR961014Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09991
10/19/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Robert Bruce Lindsay shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-10144
11/12/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on appointing as counsel for appellant. 99-11193
11/24/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice that No Transcripts are Necessary. 99-11788
01/21/2000Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 00-01009
01/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-01442
01/31/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Allow Filing of Fast Track Statement. 00-01567
02/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. he clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement provisionally submitted on January 21, 2000. fn1[We deny as moot counsel's January 31, 2000, motion to allow filing of the fast track statement.] 00-02041
02/09/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Fast track statement not signed by attorney Lindsay. 00-01009
02/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-02618
04/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 00-05870
05/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07569
05/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 12, 2000. 00-07569