judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN D. BERTRAM V. WFI STADIUM, INC.

Case Information: 11-CV-0396
Short Caption:KEVIN D. BERTRAM V. WFI STADIUM, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6899-10Filed Date:03/18/2011

Opening Event Date:03/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:08/03/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/04/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin D. Betram N
George R. PittsNN
AppelleeWfi Stadium Inc.N
Geoffrey S. GavettYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/31/2011RECORD INDEX
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (15-PGS/TAPE 2/18/11 PROC.)W/CD
03/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/04/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 18, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
04/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/18/11) (elp)
04/20/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/31/2011APPENDIX
07/01/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8/4/11. no oppo
07/11/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's MOET
08/03/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/03/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/09/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/31/2012FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Easterly,Ferren
04/26/2012FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Affirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed as to liability, the amount of damages is reversed, and this matter is remanded to the trial court for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. (Thompson and easterly, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
05/10/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
02/13/2013FiledChange Of Address Received From attorney George Pitts
02/25/2013FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Attorney Jeffrey Rhodes) (Appellant)Granted
03/05/2013FiledOrder Granting Dickstein Shapiro LLP and Jeffrey Rhodes, Esq. to withdraw
10/02/2013FiledLetter From appellee asking the Court to take action on the pending Petition for Rehearing so the parties may take the necessary steps to bring the matter to conclusion (Appellee)
12/03/2013FiledLetter From re: petition for rehearing (Appellee)
03/13/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
04/04/2014FiledMandate