judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EICON VS. MERIX

Case Information: 34965
Short Caption:EICON VS. MERIXCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399786Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/26/1999 / Jimmerson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09948
10/26/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/02/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-01659
02/15/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-02351
03/02/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-03300
03/02/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-03305
03/13/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation and Order Amending Caption. 00-03899
03/16/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The clerk of the court shall modify the caption appearing on this court's docket consistent with the caption appearing on this order. 00-04153
06/12/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-09904
06/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 00-10841
06/26/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.