judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAVANDER J. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0388
Short Caption:LAVANDER J. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-25345-08Filed Date:03/21/2011

Opening Event Date:03/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/28/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:06/04/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/02/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLavander J. Williams Y
Matthew McKenzieYN
Elaine J. GoldenbergNN
Matthew S. HellmanNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Trevor McFaddenYN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/06/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC)
05/20/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (52 pgs/Jones) 11/17/08 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (6 pgs/Kaczorowski) 7/22/09 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (12 pgs/Van Bremen) 4/15/10 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (224 pgs/Shelton) 10/19/10 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (491 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/20-25/10 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (491-694 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/26/10 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (55 pgs/Pirfo) 10/27/10 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (15 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/28/10 proc.
11/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (31 pgs/Zamora) 2/25/11 proc. w/cd
11/28/2011FiledRecord Completed
11/28/2011FiledRecord Copies
11/28/2011FiledRecord Index
11/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (SEALED pleadings)
12/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
01/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 4/30/12.
03/02/2012FiledNotice Received re: substition of counsel w/Matthew McKenzie (Appellant)Granted
03/09/2012FiledOrder Granting Notice Received re: substition of counsel w/Matthew McKenzie *construed as a motion to withdraw as counsel and redirecting appellant's brief and the appendix to be filed on or before 4/30/12. (Appellant)
04/30/2012FiledAppearance by Attorney Elaine J. Goldenber on behalf of (Appellant)
04/30/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/30/2012FiledAppendix (3 Volumes) (Appellant)
06/04/2012FiledBrief (Appellee) w/cd
06/04/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/29/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/25/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/16/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant) appearance of Elaine J. Goldenberg, Esquire and enter the appearance of Matthew S. Hellman, Esquire, as the new counsel of record.
11/07/2012FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Glickman, Newman Matthew McKenzie, Esq. for appellant Trevor McFadden, Esq. for appellee
12/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
01/03/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing En Banc until January 22, 2013 (Appellant)Granted
01/10/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 1/22/13.
01/22/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)Denied
04/24/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing.
05/02/2013FiledMandate