judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRYAN ELLIS PHELPS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0215)
Parent:S-11-0215Case Docketed On:09/20/2011
Consolidated: S-11-0216
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:BRYAN ELLIS PHELPS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRYAN ELLIS PHELPS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBryan Ellis PhelpsDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2012 WY 87
Citation:278 P.3d 1148 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/20/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/20/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/18/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/19/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/19/2011Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
10/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Join Cases for Purposes of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/24/2011Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
12/19/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' brief (advised counsel's office of W.R.A.P. Rule 1.01 (b) that requires attachments be reduced to 8 1/2 x 11 paper for future filings in this court).EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/21/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/29/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Justin Daraie obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting for Dion J. Custis obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/07/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, nine total volumes. S-11-0215 - four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder. S-11-0216 - five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits (for both cases); Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/14/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Dion Custis for Appellants; Justin Daraie for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/19/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Records signed for 7/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal