judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HARVEY H. KIRK v. STANDARD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE CO.

Case: B-2745
B-2745
05/26/1971
Application for Writ of Error
HARVEY H. KIRK
STANDARD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/27/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/05/1971Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
08/27/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/25/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/25/1971Errata FiledPetitioner
06/17/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/02/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/31/1972Response to Motion filed
01/27/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/12/1972Opinion issued
11/05/1971Brief on the Merits
08/27/1971Supplemental Brief filed
07/28/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/25/1971Response to Petition
06/25/1971Errata Filed
06/17/1971Response to Petition
06/02/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/26/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Standard Life and Accident Insurance Co.Respondent
Harvey H. KirkPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information