judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NURUSSIEN ALI V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0389
Short Caption:NURUSSIEN ALI V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD23485-10Filed Date:03/23/2011

Opening Event Date:03/23/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNurussien Ali Y
Thomas HailuYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/04/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ruth Zanoni, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
04/04/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ruth Zanoni, Esquire
05/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (36 pgs. -- Janifer) (3/15/11 proc.) w/CD.
06/30/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/06/2011RECORD INDEX
07/06/2011RECORD COPIES
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ)
08/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix
11/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until January 20, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
12/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until January 20, 2012
01/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to March 19, 2012. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before March 19, 2012
03/05/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
03/13/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to withdraw, appointing counsel and directing briefing
03/13/2012FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Thomas Hailu, Esquire (Appellant)
03/13/2012FiledBriefing Order
04/19/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/19/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
05/23/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
05/24/2012FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/23/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
10/23/2012FiledAffirmed
11/14/2012FiledMandate