judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34966
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158351Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/14/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 99-09950
10/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-10546
11/18/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 99-11452
01/11/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. 00-00447
01/12/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to State's Petition for Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. 00-00502
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. " . . . we deny this petition." fn1[We deny as moot the state's emergency motion of January 11, 2000, seeking a stay of the proceedings below]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00517
02/08/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-01960
02/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.