judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TONY PEEPLES V. WASHINGTON HUMANE SOCIETY

Case Information: 11-AA-0376
Short Caption:TONY PEEPLES V. WASHINGTON HUMANE SOCIETYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00178-11Filed Date:03/24/2011

Opening Event Date:03/24/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTony Peeples YPro SeN
RespondentWashington Humane SocietyNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/24/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/24/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/04/2011ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and petitioner is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
04/14/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file fee
05/10/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to tender the $100 filing fee within 20 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
06/13/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
06/13/2011DISMISSED
07/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED