judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAREN S. BERG and JENNIFER A. BERG v. TORRINGTON LIVESTOCK CATTLE COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation

Case Heading (S-11-0229)
Case Number:S-11-0229Case Docketed On:09/29/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:DAREN S. BERG and JENNIFER A. BERG v. TORRINGTON LIVESTOCK CATTLE COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation
Full Title:DAREN S. BERG and JENNIFER A. BERG, Appellants (Defendants), v. TORRINGTON LIVESTOCK CATTLE COMPANY, a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaren S. Berg Pro Se
AppellantJennifer A. Berg Pro Se
AppelleeTorrington Livestock Cattle Company, a Wyoming corporationPatrick J. Crank

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Contracts, Liens
Opinion Number:2012 WY 42
Citation:272 P.3d 963

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/29/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/29/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Objection filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/09/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/09/2011Event - Phone Call to Ms. Berg re service, the brief does not indicate that it was served on counsel for Appellee. Advised her to serve copy.EventPhone CallFinal
11/09/2011Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re copies of Appellants' Briefs. Will send one copy to counsel for Appellee and disgard the remainderEventPhone CallFinal
12/27/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
12/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant/Plaintiff's motion for assignment to expedited docket; and received proposed order. (Appellee Torrington Livestock Cattle Company)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/24/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/05/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal