judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ASIA C. HUGHES V. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA

Case Information: 11-AA-0394
Short Caption:ASIA C. HUGHES V. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USAClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00062-11Filed Date:03/29/2011

Opening Event Date:03/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAsia C. Hughes YPro SeN
RespondentSecuritas Security Services USANPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/29/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/29/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/12/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 29, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/12/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
05/19/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 12, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
07/22/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ hearing of 2/16/11
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/13/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and limited appendix
10/27/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
10/27/2011FiledDismissed
03/07/2012FiledMandate