judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTINEZ (CRAIG) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34977
Short Caption:MARTINEZ (CRAIG) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7313Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10001
10/22/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. September 30, 1999. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Polly C. Stipke. 99-10359
11/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11235
12/03/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-12116
03/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-05137
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06616
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on 00-06616