judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CATHY MARTIN v. PHILLIP DeWITT and JEANNE M. PRIETO

Case Heading (S-11-0228)
Case Number:S-11-0228Case Docketed On:09/29/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:CATHY MARTIN v. PHILLIP DeWITT and JEANNE M. PRIETO
Full Title:CATHY MARTIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. PHILLIP DeWITT and JEANNE M. PRIETO, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCatherine MartinJack John C. Hoard
AppelleePhillip DeWittThomas Reese
AppelleeJeanne M. PrietoThomas Reese

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/29/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/29/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/05/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellant regarding a caption for a statement of evidence. He indicated in his notice of appeal he would be filing one, but clerk has mistakenly notified this court the record is ready. He will contact clerk, may motion for extension of time.EventPhone CallFinal
10/07/2011Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from clerk of district court indicating that the Statement of Evidence has been filed and that office was unaware of statement when completion letter sent.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/11/2011Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
10/27/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal