judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRAD E. SUSKE v. RUSSELL BURBANK and ARLINE D. BURBANK

Case Heading (S-10-0042)
Case Number:S-10-0042Case Docketed On:02/18/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:BRAD E. SUSKE v. RUSSELL BURBANK and ARLINE D. BURBANK
Full Title:BRAD E. SUSKE, Petitioner, v. RUSSELL BURBANK and ARLINE D. BURBANK, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerBrad E. SuskeGeorge R. Kuvinka
RespondentRussell BurbankPeter F. Moyer
RespondentArline D. BurbankPeter F. Moyer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/18/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/18/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/18/2010Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Proposed OrderNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/03/2010Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
03/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2010Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
03/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal