judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COREY M. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0364
Short Caption:COREY M. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD22664-10Filed Date:03/18/2011

Opening Event Date:03/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/01/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCorey M. Brown Y
David H. StringerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mark A. AzizNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Stringer, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Stringer, Esquire
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (92pgs/Tape) 3/9/11 proc. w/CD
04/29/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 28, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX
05/03/2011RECORD COPIES
05/03/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (restitution information filed 3/9/11) sealed in yellow envelope
05/16/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
05/16/2011RECEIVED - statement re transcript.
06/02/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents requred by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
06/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)(no oppo).
07/29/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until August 11, 2011.
08/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until the completion of the transcripts (Appellant) (Titled: Motion to stay briefing order)Granted
10/31/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix (for RT reasons)
11/18/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (135pgs/Tape) 3/3/11 proc. w/CD
11/18/2011FiledRECORD COMPLETED
12/02/2011FiledOrdered that counsel for appellant shall within 40 days from the date of this order file the brief and limited appendix
01/25/2012FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/n 15 days.
02/10/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/17/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix and directing the appellee's brief within 30 days from the date of this order
02/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/17/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
02/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief on or before April 19, 2012
04/19/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
04/20/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/05/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
10/05/2012FiledAffirmed
11/01/2012FiledMandate