judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VALLEY FOOD DISTRIBUTING VS. MALCOMB

Case Information: 34950
Short Caption:VALLEY FOOD DISTRIBUTING VS. MALCOMBCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401104Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/26/1999 / Barker, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/04/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of David H. Benavidez--check no. 601.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09861
10/26/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Barker. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/05/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Stay Pending Supreme Court Appeal or Motion for Remand and Stay Pending Remand. 99-10919
12/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time (to oppose appellant's motion for stay). 99-12067
12/13/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 13, 2000. 99-12514
01/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Denying Motion for Stay. fn1[We grant respondent's unopposed motion to enlarge time to file a response opposing the motion for a stay, and we direct the clerk to file the response received on November 29, 1999. As appellant did not seek permission to file a reply to the response, we direct the clerk to return unfiled the reply received on December 3, 1999]. We have considered the motion and respondent's opposition, and we are not persuaded that a stay is warranted at this time. We deny appellant's motion. fn2[We also deny appellant's alternative request that we remand the case to the appeals officer]. 00-00955
01/21/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay. 99-11837
01/21/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, unfiled with letter to the McGroarty firm: original Reply to Claimant's Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Supreme Court Appeal or Motion for Remand and Stay Pending Remand. Pursuant to NRAP 27(a). 99-12109
01/21/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-00986
02/09/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-02032
02/23/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-02870
02/23/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-02871
07/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. 00-11733
07/10/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. 00-11734
07/12/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. On July 10, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation to extend the time to file the opening brief. The stipulation is treated as an unopposed motion and the motion is granted. Appellant's opening brief and joint appendix provisionally submitted on July 5, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-11956
07/12/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. 00-11480
07/12/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-11482
08/08/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 9/11/00. 00-13719
09/14/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 9/11/00. 00-16166
09/14/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-16168
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-21265
12/05/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/04/2001Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: SNP02-CY/DA/ML.
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Substantial evidence exists in the record to support the appeals officer's determination. We "AFFIRM the order of the district court denying judicial review." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20306
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20397
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20397