judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. SHERIFF, WASHOE COUNTY

Case Information: 26992
Short Caption:SMITH VS. SHERIFF, WASHOE COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV911352Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/23/1996How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/02/1995Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (Original). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
05/02/1995Other Other. Filing Fee not necessary. Check no. 2036 in the amount of $100 returned to attorney Edwin T. Basl.
05/15/1995Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/12/1995MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including June 21, 1995, to file the opening brief.
06/22/1995BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 6/21/95).
07/24/1995BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (hand delivered 7/24/95).
08/24/1995MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including September 25, 1995, to file the Reply Brief.
09/26/1995BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 9/25/95).
12/05/1995Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of May 23, 1996, on the record and briefs filed herein. This appeal may be decided at such time prior to the submission date as the court's calendar permits.
05/23/1996Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/19/1996Other Other. Filing Appellant's Supplemental Memorandum.
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/CY/ML 00-15257
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 00-15429
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 28, 2000. 00-15429