Case Heading (S-10-0036) | |||||
Case Number: | S-10-0036 | Case Docketed On: | 02/12/2010 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Sublette County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract | ||
Short Title: | JOE'S CONCRETE AND LUMBER, INC., ENERCREST, INC., and ENERCREST PRODUCTS, INC., Wyoming Corporations v. CONCRETE WORKS OF COLORADO, INC., a Colorado Corporation, and HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana Company, doing business as a Foreign Insurance Company | ||||
Full Title: | JOE'S CONCRETE AND LUMBER, INC., ENERCREST, INC., and ENERCREST PRODUCTS, INC., Wyoming Corporations, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CONCRETE WORKS OF COLORADO, INC., a Colorado Corporation, and HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana Company, doing business as a Foreign Insurance Company, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Joe's Concrete and Lumber, Inc. | Andrea L. Richard |
Appellant | Enercrest, Inc. | Andrea L. Richard |
Appellant | Enercrest Products, Inc. | Andrea L. Richard |
Appellee | Concrete Works of Colorado, Inc. | William H. Twichell |
Appellee | Hartford Casualty Insurance Company | William H. Twichell |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Attorney Fees |
Opinion Number: | 2011 WY 74 |
Citation: | 252 P.3d 445 (Wyo. 2011) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
02/12/2010 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
02/12/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
02/12/2010 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
02/12/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
02/12/2010 | Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Golden | Notice-Internal | Recusal memo | Final | |
04/01/2010 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
04/05/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Opening Brief of Appellants (Attachments not reduced) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/09/2010 | Motion - Dismiss - involuntary | Motion | Dismiss - involuntary | Final | |
04/13/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal - Involuntary | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/23/2010 | Response/Objection - Motion | Response/Objection | Motion | Final | |
04/26/2010 | Event - Rejected Filing - designation of record. Document had Supreme Court case caption. Instructed counsel to file in district court and send hard copy to Supreme Court. | Event | Rejected Filing | Final | |
05/04/2010 | Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Order Sanctioning Appellants' Counsel | Order | Deny | Final | |
05/19/2010 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Concrete Works of Colorado, Inc. and Hartford Casualty Insurance Company | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/27/2010 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
05/28/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Attachment - notice of payment of sanction. Advised counsel in comments regarding deficiencies of filing. | Notice-Incoming | Attachment | Final | |
06/01/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received of notice of submitting sanction. However, the sanction check was not included as indicated. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/01/2010 | Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel for appellant's office and requested the original and six copies of her response to the motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to the Court's order of 5/4/10; and requested payment of sanction which was not included with notice of payment. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
06/01/2010 | Event - Phone Call. Received call from appellant's office indicating that the check and copies have been fedex'ed. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
06/01/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of submitting sanction pursuant to court's May 4, 2010 order (received by Federal Express with check enclosed). | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/01/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Concrete Works of Colorado's motion to dismiss appeal. (Received by Federal Express) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/01/2010 | Fees - Sanctions received - other (Received by Federal Express) | Fees | Sanctions received - other | Final | |
06/08/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/09/2010 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
06/10/2010 | Order - Assignment of judge - Robert E. Skar, District Judge, is assigned to act in this matter for Justice Golden who is recused. | Order | Assignment of judge/justice | Final | |
06/21/2010 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcript Excerpts | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/29/2010 | Event - Expedited Assignment | Event | Brief Only Assignment | Final | |
05/02/2011 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/18/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/18/2011 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/18/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/18/2011 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/23/2011 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/20/2011. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |