judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTWAN M. WASHINGTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0380
Short Caption:ANTWAN M. WASHINGTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:11-CF-0380Consolidated: 11-CO-1272
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-27223-09Filed Date:03/22/2011

Opening Event Date:03/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/19/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/16/2013
Argued/Submitted:12/03/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/11/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Angela G. Schmidt NN
Lauren R. BatesYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/06/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC)
05/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/25/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 11-CF-380 and 11-CO-1272. Initial Order.
11/16/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (11-CO-1272) (Appellant)
03/14/2012FiledRecord Index (both)
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (5 pgs/tape) 12/29/09 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (232 pgs/Gilliam) 12/31/09 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (12 pgs/tape) 2/4/10 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (35 pgs/Armstrong) 4/20/10 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (268 pgs/Armstrong) 4/21/10 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (108 pgs/Wood) 4/26/10 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (13 pgs/McCarn) 6/30/10 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (16 pgs/Gilliam) 7/14/10 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (22 pgs/Davis) 1/19/11 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (24 pgs/Hunt) 2/18/11 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (33 pgs/Walker) 3/17/11 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (232 pgs/Gilliam) 8/8/11 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (233-360 pgs/Gilliam) 8/9/11 proc. w/cd
03/27/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
04/04/2012FiledOrder that counsel for appellant shall w/n 10 calendar days provide this court with the necessary documentation.
04/11/2012FiledMotion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Appellant)Granted
04/19/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Appellant) and Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)
04/19/2012VacatedAppointing Counsel/CJA Bruce A. Johnson Jr., Esquire (Appellant)
05/08/2012FiledLetter To appellant's counsel (Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire) regarding his clients letter requesting new counsel.
05/16/2012FiledLetter From Appellant in regards to his court-appointed counsel (Appellant)
05/22/2012FiledLetter To Bruce A. Johnson, Esquire, regarding Mr. Washington's letter to the Clerk.
06/07/2012FiledLetter From appellant's counsel to the Clerk of the Court regarding resolution of issues on representation of his client (Appellant)
06/12/2012FiledLetter From appellant's counsel to the Clerk of the Court regarding resolution of issues on representation of his client (Appellant) (Appellant)
06/14/2012FiledLetter To Antwan Washington re: request for appointment of new counsel
06/15/2012FiledORDER SUA SPONTE THAT THE APPOINTMENT OF BRUCE JOHNSON IS VACATED AND *****KEVIN FAHEY IS APPOINTED TO APPELLANT and K. FAHEY SHALL FILE THE BRIEF W/N 60 DAYS
07/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #14 (9pgs/Tape) 3/9/10 proc.
07/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #15 (5pgs/Tape) 3/29/10 proc.
07/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #16 (16pgs/Maar) 10/22/10 proc. w/CD
07/19/2012FiledRecord Completed
08/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 10/13/12
10/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/12/12
11/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 12/12/12
12/12/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 2/10/13.
02/12/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief out of Time (Appellant)Granted
02/15/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Brief and limited appendix out of Time (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w.n 30 days.
02/15/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/15/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
03/14/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until May 16, 2013 (Appellee)Granted
03/19/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until May 16, 2013 (Appellee)
05/16/2013FiledMotion for leave to supplement the record on appeal with documents contained in the brief and appendix (Appellee)Granted
05/16/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/16/2013FiledBriefing Completed
05/30/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion for leave to supplement the record on appeal with documents contained in the brief and appendix (Appellee)
06/07/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (Superior Court documents)
07/11/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief for 90 days (Appellant)Granted
07/24/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/25/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief for 90 days (Appellant) to 9/9/13
11/01/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/12/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/12/2013FiledMotion Requesting Oral Argument on the Summary Calendar (Appellant)Granted
11/15/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
11/15/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/19/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
11/27/2013FiledMemorandum - Attorney Bates will argue in place of Attorney Schmidt (Appellee)
12/03/2013FiledArgued Before Associate Judges Glickman, Beckwith, and Senior Judge Farrell. (A. Kevin Fahey Esq.,for appellant) (Lauren Bates Esq.,for appellee).
12/11/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Beckwith, Associate Judges; and Farrell, Senior Judge)
01/02/2014WithdrawnMandate*************************RECALLED 1/16/14
01/07/2014FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Granted
01/10/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
01/16/2014FiledOrder Granting Motion To Recall Mandate and any PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC SHALL BE FILED BY 2/14/14...
02/14/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
05/29/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc.
06/09/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
06/11/2014FiledMandate