judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRY M. LIGGINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0381
Short Caption:TERRY M. LIGGINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead:11-CO-0381Consolidated: 11-CO-0438
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7638-01Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:08/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerry M. Liggins YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Travis A. Hill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 14, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
04/08/2011RECORD INDEX (11CO381)
04/08/2011RECORD COPIES (11CO381)
04/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/29/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S BRIEF (for both appeals...see 7/14/11 order)
04/29/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
05/05/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 11-CO-381 and 11-CO-438 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 11-CO-438, will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index and record copies required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/06/2011RECORD INDEX (11CO438)
05/06/2011RECORD COPIES (11CO438)
05/26/2011ORDERED: That appellant's brief, addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 11-CO-438, shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's consolidated brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (By: JAC)
06/23/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to Court's Order date 5/26/11.
07/14/2011FiledOrdered that the appellant's brief filed in appeal no. 11-co-381 is considered as the consolidated brief for these appeals and directing appellee's brief
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief to September 16, 2011 (Served by: DCCA on 8/23/11). Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion to file the reply brief and the lodged reply brief
09/15/2011Filedreply brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/11/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte scheduling on Summary Calendar.
10/11/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/01/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Pryor
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Oberly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
12/01/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for reh/reh en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate
02/17/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari Filed in US Supreme Court on 2/9/12 #11-8842. (Appellant)
03/20/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)