judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HITTER FAMILY LTD PARTNERSHIP VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36470
Short Caption:HITTER FAMILY LTD PARTNERSHIP VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A381610Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/24/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Chase Publications, Inc.--check no. 18566.
07/24/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandate, or in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition. 00-12712
08/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Granting Temporary Stay, Directing Answer to Petition, and Directing Response to Motion for Stay. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an answer. It appears that a temporary stay is warranted. The proceedings in district court case No. A381610 are stayed pending further order of this court. We direct the real parties in interest to file a response to petitioners' motion for stay within 15 days of the date of this order. 00-15337
09/18/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion of real Parties in Interest Charles R. Abbott and Bruce Y. Yates for Extension to file a Response to Petitioners' Motion for Stay (first request). 00-16396
09/25/2000MotionReceived Response to Motion. Opposition of Real Parties in Interest, Charles R. Abbott and Bruce Y. Yates, to Petitioners' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment. Mailed on: 9/21/00. 00-16839
10/02/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Parties in Interst, Charles R. Abbott and Bruce Y. Yates, to Petition for Writ of Mandate, or in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition. 00-17338
10/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 18, 2000, the real parties in interest filed a motion for an extension of time to file a response. We grant the unopposed motion. We direct the clerk of this court to file the response received on September 25, 2000. 00-18534
10/19/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition of Real parties in Interest, Charles R. Abbott and Bruce Y. Yates, to Petitioners' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment. 00-16839
11/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Granting in Part and Dismissing in Part Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . the petition is dismissed with respect to the partnership . . . the petition is granted in part." The clerk of this court shall issue a writ of mandamus. fn2[We note that as we dismiss the petition with respect to the partnership, Abbott and Yates may still proceed to execute on assets of the partnership, may be subject to examination and may be ordered to produce the partnership's records in aid of execution.] fn3[In light of this order, we vacate the temporary stay granted by this court by order dated August 31, 2000.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19994
11/15/2000WritIssued Writ. Certified copy of writ and order mailed to Judge Mark R. Denton, District Judge, by this office. 00-20030
11/15/2000WritFiled Writ. Served on Hon. Mark Denton, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day. 00-20030
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-20122
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.