judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VIRGINIA L. WALTERS v. LONNIE WALTERS

Case Heading (S-10-0059)
Case Number:S-10-0059Case Docketed On:03/16/2010
Linked To: S-09-0152
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:VIRGINIA L. WALTERS v. LONNIE WALTERS
Full Title:VIRGINIA L. WALTERS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LONNIE WALTERS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVirginia L. WaltersKristin Shaun Wilkerson
AppelleeLonnie WaltersMary T. Parsons

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contempt
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/16/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/23/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
03/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to ConsolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/06/2010Order - Consolidating cases (No extensions of time allowed)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Virginia Walters and Designation of Record. (Extra copies received, but no postage-paid envelope included)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/22/2010Service - Other - Received postage-paid envelope for return of filed-stamped copies of brief. Returned this day.ServiceOtherFinal
06/01/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/22/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/29/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/20/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/22/2011Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellee re mandate and costs, suggested that motion be filedEventPhone CallFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/25/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/25/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/29/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/28/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/18/2012Record - Record returned to district court, transcript discovered in Justice's fileRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal