judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVIDSON LAND COMPANY, LLC v. SUELLEN L. DAVIDSON, CHARLES NOLLER DAVIDSON, and DEBORAH J. DAVIDSON

Case Heading (S-10-0060)
Case Number:S-10-0060Case Docketed On:03/22/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:DAVIDSON LAND COMPANY, LLC v. SUELLEN L. DAVIDSON, CHARLES NOLLER DAVIDSON, and DEBORAH J. DAVIDSON
Full Title:DAVIDSON LAND COMPANY, LLC, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SUELLEN L. DAVIDSON, CHARLES NOLLER DAVIDSON, and DEBORAH J. DAVIDSON, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavidson Land Company, LLCSteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeSuellen L. DavidsonAlexander K. Davison
AppelleeCharles Noller DavidsonAlexander K. Davison
AppelleeDeborah DavidsonGreg Weisz
David Andrew Henry Sills
Megan Overmann Goetz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2011 WY 29
Citation:247 P.3d 67 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/22/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/22/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/10/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Attachment (Attachment is on hard copy of Appellant's Brief)Notice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
05/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2010Brief - Appellees Suellen Davidson and Charles Noller Davidson.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Suellen L. Davidson and Charles Noller DavidsonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellee Deborah J. DavidsonBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
07/12/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/15/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/20/2010Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for appellant and requested hard copies of reply brief that was e-filed on 7/12/10.EventPhone CallFinal
07/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution - Megan Goetz for Deborah Davidson.Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance of Co-CounselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Alexander Davison for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - C.M. Aron for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Steve C.M. Aron for appellant; Alexander K. Davison for appellees; no argument for appellee Deborah J. Davidson) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
01/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees Suellen L. Davison and Charles Noller Davidson's notice of submittal of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/24/2011Motion - Strike - Notice of Submittal of Additional AuthorityMotionStrikeFinal
01/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to strike submittal of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/16/2011Order - Denying Motion to Strike Submittal of Additional AuthorityOrderDenyFinal
02/18/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/08/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/08/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/9/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal