judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL JOSEPH BURNS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0053)
Case Number:S-10-0053Case Docketed On:03/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DANIEL JOSEPH BURNS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL JOSEPH BURNS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel Joseph BurnsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2011 WY 5
Citation:246 P.3d 283

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/21/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/29/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting form David Delicath to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Delicath for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; David Delicath, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/03/2011Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
02/03/2011Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
02/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Brief in Support of PetitionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/25/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/24/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal