judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. HARRIS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0373
Short Caption:CHARLES E. HARRIS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CDC10404-10Filed Date:03/16/2011

Opening Event Date:03/16/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles E. Harris NPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/16/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/05/2011ORDERED: That appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a motion and fully completed financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis pursuant to D.C. App. R. 24 (3). Failure to comply with this order may result in appellant being deemed as proceeding pro se. (By: JAC)
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
05/04/2011ORDER DENY APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall proceed on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW)
11/29/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
12/22/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
12/22/2011FiledDismissed
01/13/2012FiledMandate