judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS L. WILSON and HELEN L. WILSON, Husband and Wife v. PATRICK T. TYRRELL, in His Capacity as State Engineer for the State of Wyoming and LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY

Case Heading (S-10-0054)
Case Number:S-10-0054Case Docketed On:03/05/2010
Linked To: S-10-0055 , S-10-0119
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:THOMAS L. WILSON and HELEN L. WILSON, Husband and Wife v. PATRICK T. TYRRELL, in His Capacity as State Engineer for the State of Wyoming and LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY
Full Title:THOMAS L. WILSON and HELEN L. WILSON, Husband and Wife, Appellants (Petitioners), v. PATRICK T. TYRRELL, in His Capacity as State Engineer for the State of Wyoming, Appellee (Respondent), and LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY, Appellee (Intervenor).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas L. WilsonFrank J. Jones
AppellantHelen L. WilsonFrank J. Jones
AppelleeState Engineer's Office - State EngineerBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
S. Jane Caton
Peter K. Michael
AppelleeLucerne Canal and Power CompanyHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Rights, Easements, Water Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 7
Citation:246 P.3d 265

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/05/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/22/2010Brief - Appellant and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
04/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Thomas L. Wilson and Helen L. WilsonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/08/2010Brief - Appellee - State Engineer.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee Wyoming State Engineer; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2010Brief - Appellee Lucerne Canal and Power CompanyBriefAppelleeFinal
06/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Lucerne Canal and Power CompanyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Lucerne Canal and Power Company's Consolidated Motion and Memorandum for Separate Oral Argument from Case No,. S-10-0055.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/16/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
06/16/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant, proposed Order included with hard copiesEventPhone CallFinal
06/16/2010Motion - Other - Separate 0ral ArgumentMotionOtherFinal
06/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to consolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Appellants' Motion to Consolidate CasesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Lucerne Canal and Power Company's response to motion to consolidate casesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2010Order - Granting, in part, motion to consolidate cases and order granting motion for separate argument (all three cases consolidated for decision, oral argument in cases S-10-0055 and S-10-0119 will be held separately from S-10-0054)OrderGrantFinal
07/07/2010Event - Phone Call - Spoke with Bonnie Petsch, Clerk of District Court, regarding the record requests in two of these cases. She is going to send the record in case S-10-0054 as it is completed. She will then send the record in both S-10-0055 & S-10-0119 once we request the record in S-10-0119 as briefing hasn't been completed yet and they both involve the same record.EventPhone CallFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/12/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/09/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Lucerne Canal and Power Company's Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Oral Argument; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
08/20/2010Event - Phone Call - contacted Ms. Caton's office and let her know case has been vacated - had received receipt acknowledgement form.EventPhone CallFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting Harriet Hageman for appellee Lucerne Canal & Power Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - S. Jane Caton for State Engineer.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to vacate and reset; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2010Order - Oral argument - amending schedule - order vacating and rescheduling argument. (From 10/19/10 to 10/21/10).OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
09/27/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Jones for Thomas and Helen Wilson.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Frank Jones for appellants; S. Jane Caton, Senior Assistant Attorney General for State Engineer and Harriet M. Hageman for Lucerne Canal and Power Company.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal