judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. BOYD DAVIS v. JOHN GRAY, ET AL.

Case: B-2760
B-2760
06/02/1971
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
J. BOYD DAVIS
JOHN GRAY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/05/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/07/1971Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/07/1971Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
07/06/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1971Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
06/02/1971Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/05/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/28/1971Opinion issued
07/07/1971Brief on the Merits
07/07/1971Exhibits in case/cause filed
07/06/1971Response to Petition
07/06/1971Amendment to Motion filed
06/04/1971Document filed (see remarks)
06/02/1971Exhibits in case/cause filed
06/02/1971Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. Boyd DavisPetitioner
John Gray, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information