judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FOLEY VS. ELARDI

Case Information: 34957
Short Caption:FOLEY VS. ELARDICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A347853Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/04/1999 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard & Anderson.
10/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09881
10/12/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/12/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/21/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 99-10310
10/25/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Brian Berman-check no. 006914.
10/26/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James R. Crockett, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/04/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 99-10804
11/04/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson.
11/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 10/11/99. 99-10998
11/09/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondents' Request for Permission to File Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. 99-11078
01/27/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-01370
02/17/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file a docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We defer ruling on respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal pending receipt of the docketing statement. Appellant shall not be required to file the transcript request form until resolution of the motion to dismiss.] (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-02510
03/02/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-03310
05/23/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Having concluded that we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, we grant respondents' motion to dismiss, and " . . . we dismiss this appeal witout prejudice to appellant's right to appeal from a final judgment." fn1[In light of our disposition of this appeal, we deny respondents' motion to file a reply to the opposition as moot.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-08630
06/20/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10374
06/20/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 2000. 00-10374