judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIANE BAILEY v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0051)
Case Number:S-10-0051Case Docketed On:03/02/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:DIANE BAILEY v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:DIANE BAILEY, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDiane BaileyStephenson Dow Emery
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 152
Citation:243 P.3d 953 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filled in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received, rejected e-filing. Returned to CounselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/04/2010Brief - Appellee; and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/22/2010Brief - Petitioner reply (appellant reply)BriefPetitioner replyFinal
06/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/30/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/20/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/02/2010Motion - Fees and costs (filed affidavits attached to motion)MotionFees and costsFinal
12/02/2010Motion - Fees and costs (invoice only - should have been attached to above motion)MotionFees and costsFinal
12/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for payment of attorney's fees to appellant-petitioner's attorney with invoice attached; affidavit of Stephenson D. Emery; affidavit of Margot Elizabeth Glendenning; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2010Event - Phone Call from AG, do not object to attorney fees requestEventPhone CallFinal
01/04/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/6/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal